Dr. Abira Basu | 05/05/2010 to 07/06/2010
| Civil Judge cum Judicial Magistrate First Class, Court No. II, Hamirpur HP |
Ms. Anuja Sood | 23/04/2007 to 04/08/2009
| Civil Judge cum Judicial Magistrate First Class, Court No. II, Hamirpur HP |
Ms. Parveen Chauhan | 20/06/2005 to 16/04/2007
| Civil Judge cum Judicial Magistrate First Class, Court No. II, Hamirpur HP |
Ms. Kanta Verma | 15/03/2004 to 06/06/2005
| Civil Judge cum Judicial Magistrate First Class, Court No. II, Hamirpur HP |
Ms. Aparna Sharma | 11/12/2000 to 08/03/2004
| Civil Judge cum Judicial Magistrate First Class, Court No. II, Hamirpur HP |
Shri Hans Raj | 03/06/1999 to 11/12/2000
| Civil Judge cum Judicial Magistrate First Class, Court No. II, Hamirpur HP |
Shri Yogesh Jaswal | 08/07/1996 to 03/06/1999
| Civil Judge cum Judicial Magistrate First Class, Court No. II, Hamirpur HP |
Shri B. L. Soni | 17/10/1994 to 17/05/1995
| Civil Judge cum Judicial Magistrate First Class, Court No. II, Hamirpur HP |
Shri Manoj Kumar Bansal | 29/04/1991 to 05/09/1994
| Civil Judge cum Judicial Magistrate First Class, Court No. II, Hamirpur HP |
Shri A. S. Jaswal | 01/06/1987 to 18/04/1991
| Civil Judge cum Judicial Magistrate First Class, Court No. II, Hamirpur HP |
Shri C. L. Kochhar | 11/09/1984 to 20/05/1987
| Civil Judge cum Judicial Magistrate First Class, Court No. II, Hamirpur HP |
Shri J. S. Mahantan | 25/10/1982 to 01/09/1984
| Civil Judge cum Judicial Magistrate First Class, Court No. II, Hamirpur HP |
Ms. Anita Sharma | 06/08/2021 to 07/12/2021
| Civil Judge cum Judicial Magistrate First Class, Court No. III, Hamirpur HP |
Ms. Anshu Chaudhary | 28/12/2018 to 05/08/2021
| Civil Judge cum Judicial Magistrate First Class, Court No. III, Hamirpur HP |
Shri Gaurav Chaudhary | 02/01/2017 to 28/12/2018
| Civil Judge cum Judicial Magistrate First Class, Court No. III, Hamirpur HP |
Ms. Anshu Chaudhary | 11/11/2016 to 02/11/2017
| Civil Judge cum Judicial Magistrate First Class, Court No. III, Hamirpur HP |
Shri Nishant Verma | 31/07/2015 to 05/11/2016
| Civil Judge cum Judicial Magistrate First Class, Court No. III, Hamirpur HP |
Shri Vikas Gupta | 24/04/2014 to 14/07/2015
| Civil Judge cum Judicial Magistrate First Class, Court No. III, Hamirpur HP |
Ms. Monika Sombal | 26/08/2013 to 24/04/2014
| Civil Judge cum Judicial Magistrate First Class, Court No. III, Hamirpur HP |
Shri Hakikat Dhanda | 07/11/2012 to 06/05/2013
| Civil Judge cum Judicial Magistrate First Class, Court No. III, Hamirpur HP |