Shri Nitin Mittal | 11/08/2021 to 03/04/2023
| Senior Civil Judge cum Additional Chief Judicial Magistrate, Court No. I, Hamirpur, HP |
Ms. Neha Dahiya | 28/12/2018 to 05/08/2021
| Senior Civil Judge cum Additional Chief Judicial Magistrate, Court No. I, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri Vikrant Kaundal | 07/05/2016 to 21/12/2018
| Senior Civil Judge cum Additional Chief Judicial Magistrate, Court No. I, Hamirpur, HP |
Ms. Gurmeet Kaur | 26/04/2014 to 03/05/2016
| Senior Civil Judge cum Additional Chief Judicial Magistrate, Court No. I, Hamirpur, HP |
Ms. Parveen Chauhan | 20/06/2013 to 24/04/2014
| Senior Civil Judge cum Additional Chief Judicial Magistrate, Court No. I, Hamirpur, HP |
Dr. Abira Basu | 13/07/2012 to 01/05/2013
| Senior Civil Judge cum Additional Chief Judicial Magistrate, Court No. I, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri Sidharth Sarpal | 29/07/2010 to 06/07/2012
| Senior Civil Judge cum Additional Chief Judicial Magistrate, Court No. I, Hamirpur, HP |
Dr. Abira Basu | 07/06/2010 to 09/07/2010
| Senior Civil Judge cum Additional Chief Judicial Magistrate, Court No. I, Hamirpur, HP |
Ms. Aparna Sharma | 06/08/2009 to 07/05/2010
| Senior Civil Judge cum Additional Chief Judicial Magistrate, Court No. I, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri Padam Singh | 23/04/2007 to 16/02/2009
| Senior Civil Judge cum Additional Chief Judicial Magistrate, Court No. I, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri Rajesh Chauhan | 20/06/2005 to 16/04/2007
| Senior Civil Judge cum Additional Chief Judicial Magistrate, Court No. I, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri Naresh Kumar | 15/03/2004 to 06/06/2005
| Senior Civil Judge cum Additional Chief Judicial Magistrate, Court No. I, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri R. K. Sharma | 17/04/2001 to 15/03/2004
| Senior Civil Judge cum Additional Chief Judicial Magistrate, Court No. I, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri Hans Raj | 11/12/2000 to 16/04/2001
| Senior Civil Judge cum Additional Chief Judicial Magistrate, Court No. I, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri K. S. Chandel | 24/06/1997 to 30/09/2000
| Senior Civil Judge cum Additional Chief Judicial Magistrate, Court No. I, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri Pritam Singh | 23/08/1994 to 12/08/1996
| Senior Civil Judge cum Additional Chief Judicial Magistrate, Court No. I, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri R. K. Kaushal | 29/04/1991 to 30/07/1994
| Senior Civil Judge cum Additional Chief Judicial Magistrate, Court No. I, Hamirpur, HP |
Ms. Geetika Kapila | 09/12/2021 to 16/04/2024
| Senior Civil Judge cum Additional Chief Judicial Magistrate |
Ms. Kanika Chawla | 31/08/2019 to 07/12/2021
| Senior Civil Judge cum Additional Chief Judicial Magistrate, Nadaun, Hamirpur HP |
Shri Subhash Chand Bhaseen | 16/01/2017 to 31/08/2020
| Senior Civil Judge cum Additional Chief Judicial Magistrate, Nadaun, Hamirpur HP |