Shri P. P. Ranta | 30/10/2009 to 04/06/2012
| Senior Civil Judge cum Chief Judicial Magistrate, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri Rakesh Kainthla | 04/05/2006 to 05/08/2009
| Senior Civil Judge cum Chief Judicial Magistrate, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri Purender Vaidya | 24/01/2004 to 01/05/2006
| Senior Civil Judge cum Chief Judicial Magistrate, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri S. L. Sharma | 29/09/2003 to 23/12/2003
| Senior Civil Judge cum Chief Judicial Magistrate, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri S. C. Kainthla | 20/12/2002 to 17/09/2003
| Senior Civil Judge cum Chief Judicial Magistrate, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri K. L. Sharma | 26/04/2001 to 29/11/2002
| Senior Civil Judge cum Chief Judicial Magistrate, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri K. S. Chandel | 29/09/2000 to 16/04/2001
| Senior Civil Judge cum Chief Judicial Magistrate, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri J. S. Mahantan | 23/06/1997 to 28/09/2000
| Senior Civil Judge cum Chief Judicial Magistrate, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri R. K. Mittal | 27/06/1996 to 13/06/1997
| Senior Civil Judge cum Chief Judicial Magistrate, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri Ravinder Parkash | 29/01/1996 to 13/06/1996
| Senior Civil Judge cum Chief Judicial Magistrate, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri A. C. Thalwal | 16/08/1995 to 09/01/1996
| Senior Civil Judge cum Chief Judicial Magistrate, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri J. L. Gupta | 25/05/1992 to 02/08/1995
| Senior Civil Judge cum Chief Judicial Magistrate, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri. P. D. Goyal | 01/08/1989 to 05/05/1992
| Senior Civil Judge cum Chief Judicial Magistrate, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri K. C. Negi | 01/06/1987 to 20/03/1989
| Senior Civil Judge cum Chief Judicial Magistrate, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri Shamsher Singh | 11/09/1984 to 20/05/1987
| Senior Civil Judge cum Chief Judicial Magistrate, Hamirpur, HP |
Ms. Kiran Aggarwal | 09/04/1981 to 10/09/1984
| Senior Civil Judge cum Chief Judicial Magistrate, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri O. P. Sharma | 30/04/1980 to 18/04/1981
| Senior Civil Judge cum Chief Judicial Magistrate, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri. V. K. Ahuja | 17/01/1979 to 09/04/1980
| Senior Civil Judge cum Chief Judicial Magistrate, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri R. K. Gupta | 14/11/1977 to 16/01/1979
| Senior Civil Judge cum Chief Judicial Magistrate, Hamirpur, HP |
Shri Janeshwar Goyal | 21/01/1976 to 01/11/1977
| Senior Civil Judge cum Chief Judicial Magistrate, Hamirpur, HP |